open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Wisconsin

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Wisconsin
    Case Number:3:19-cr-00008-1
    Party Name:United States of America v. Bulovsky, Matthew
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Forfeiture of Property ]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice to Counsel]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:April 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Expert Testimony]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Motion Hearing Order]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Telephone Pretrial Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:March 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Convert Pretrial Motion Hearing to Telephonic]
    Date Published:March 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:February 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Government Discovery Letter]
    Date Published:February 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bail Report]
    Date Published:January 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Arraignment/Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wiwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?43176
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =