Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Wisconsin

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Wisconsin
    Case Number:3:19-cr-00042-1
    Party Name:United States of America v. Ostrum, Bobby
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Government Discovery Letter]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:April 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bail Report]
    Date Published:April 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:April 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Arraignment/Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Issued]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [JS-45 Criminal Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wiwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?43492
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =