open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
    Case Number:2:19-cr-00092-1
    Party Name:USA v. Hilliard
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Case]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment ]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Recommendation - SEALED]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revised Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum ]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Case No Longer Referred]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Referred to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Counsel - Federal Public Defender]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention ]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing ]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case No Longer Referred]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document ]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed with arrest]
    Date Published:June 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:May 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Order]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Services Report - Bond Study]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wied.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?85776
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =