open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00090-1
    Party Name:USA v. Miranda-Perez
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case No Longer Referred]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention ]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Order]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed with arrest]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Counsel - Federal Public Defender]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing ]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Prior Record Update Memo]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wied.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?85770
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =