open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Wisconsin

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Wisconsin
    Case Number:3:19-cr-00060-1
    Party Name:United States of America v. Stroman, John
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:July 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:June 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Telephone Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:May 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Government Discovery Letter]
    Date Published:May 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Status/Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bail Report]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:May 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:May 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Arraignment/Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:May 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [JS-45 Criminal Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Issued]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wiwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?43792
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =