open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Wisconsin

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Wisconsin
    Case Number:3:19-cr-00061-1
    Party Name:United States of America v. Lacey-Robinson, Sedale
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:July 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:June 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
    Date Published:June 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:June 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Government Discovery Letter]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bail Report]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Arraignment/Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Attorney Appointed]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Issued]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [JS-45 Criminal Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wiwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?43790
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =