open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Wisconsin

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Wisconsin
    Case Number:3:19-cr-00059-1
    Party Name:United States of America v. Kainu, Brian
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Government Discovery Letter]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:June 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:June 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:June 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bail Report]
    Date Published:May 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:May 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:May 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Arraignment/Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Issued]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [JS-45 Criminal Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wiwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?43788
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =