open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Wisconsin

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Wisconsin
    Case Number:3:19-cr-00058-1
    Party Name:United States of America v. De Florencio-Parra, Cesar
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice to CJA Appointed Attorney]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment - Redacted]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revised Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Addendum to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:August 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter stating no objections to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Government Discovery Letter]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bail Report]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Arraignment/Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment]
    Date Published:May 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Attorney Appointed]
    Date Published:May 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Issued]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [JS-45 Criminal Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wiwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?43784
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =