open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin

WISCONSIN PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
    Case Number:2:19-cv-01313
    Party Name:Griffin v. Foster
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:January 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice by Clerk to Counsel Re Consent to Magistrate]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Acceptance of Service by DOJ]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Filing Fee Received]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter (From Court)]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter from Clerk re Consent to Magistrate]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wied.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?87015
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =