open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Wisconsin

WISCONSIN PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Wisconsin
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00747
    Party Name:Buell, Virginia v. Saul, Andrew
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Remand]
    Date Published:February 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remand]
    Date Published:February 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief in Support]
    Date Published:January 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security Hearing Transcript]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [WMC Order on Oral Argument]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [PAO Order Granting IFP]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Standard Attachments Sent]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add Judge for Shell Case Opening]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wiwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?44425
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =