open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin

WISCONSIN PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
    Case Number:1:20-cv-00234
    Party Name:Getzik et al v. Hendrickson Chiropractic Office, S.C. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Terminate Case - Notice Attorneys]
    Date Published:June 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:June 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:May 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:May 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:May 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report of Rule 26(f) Plan]
    Date Published:May 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Counterclaim]
    Date Published:April 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:April 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer and Counterclaim]
    Date Published:April 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Judge Assignment]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.wied.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?88819
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =