open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin

WISCONSIN PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
    Case Number:2:20-cr-00031-1
    Party Name:USA v. Samano-Aguilar
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Referred to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - Felony]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case No Longer Referred]
    Date Published:March 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document ]
    Date Published:March 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
    Date Published:March 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention ]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Order]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Services Report - Bond Study]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.wied.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?88787
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =