open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Wisconsin

WISCONSIN PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Wisconsin
    Case Number:3-20-12057-cjf
    Party Name:Jeremy Wayne Keck
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zeddun, Brenda L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution (341 Filings)]
    Date Published:August 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zeddun, Brenda L. [Letter]
    Date Published:August 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zeddun, Brenda L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zeddun, Brenda L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zeddun, Brenda L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Re: Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zeddun, Brenda L. [Notice (1st) re: Financial Management Course (Ch 7/13) (auto form)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zeddun, Brenda L. [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zeddun, Brenda L. [Proof of Service]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zeddun, Brenda L. [Employee Income Records (Debtors Payment Advices)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zeddun, Brenda L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7-Indivdual/NoAsset]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zeddun, Brenda L. [Auto-docket of credit card]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-docket of credit card]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zeddun, Brenda L. [Form 122A-1 Chapter 7 Statement of Monthly Income]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Form 122A-1 Chapter 7 Statement of Monthly Income]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zeddun, Brenda L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7-NEVER USE)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zeddun, Brenda L. [Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Zeddun, Brenda L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7-NEVER USE)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.wiwb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?187564
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =