open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin

WISCONSIN PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
    Case Number:20-25508-beh
    Party Name:David C Winter and Tracy L Winter
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Garcia, Rebecca R. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:September 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Garcia, Rebecca R. [Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules]
    Date Published:September 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Garcia, Rebecca R. [Amended Schedules (No Fee Required)]
    Date Published:September 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Garcia, Rebecca R. [Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee Required)]
    Date Published:September 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Garcia, Rebecca R. [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Garcia, Rebecca R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Garcia, Rebecca R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Garcia, Rebecca R. [Order to Pay Wages]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Garcia, Rebecca R. [Notice of Debtors Prior Filing (Active Event)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Garcia, Rebecca R. [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Garcia, Rebecca R. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Garcia, Rebecca R. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Garcia, Rebecca R. [Voluntary Petition - Attorney (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.wieb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?432892
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =