U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Wisconsin

wisconsin Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00048-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Payton, Marcus
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 13, 2023: [Judgment and Commitment - Redacted]
  • January 13, 2023: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 13, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • January 09, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Revised Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 30, 2022: [Addendum to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 21, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 13, 2022: [Letter stating no objections to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 07, 2022: [Government Discovery Letter]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Plea Hearing]
  • September 26, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 19, 2022: [Government Discovery Letter]
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice of Expert Testimony]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Pretrial Motion Hearing Order]
  • August 18, 2022: [Telephone Pretrial Motion Hearing]
  • August 09, 2022: [Convert Pretrial Motion Hearing to Telephonic]
  • August 09, 2022: [Letter stating no pretrial motions to be filed]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Government Discovery Letter]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [SLC Order on New Criminal Cases]
  • June 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Status/Scheduling Conference]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Government Discovery Letter]
  • May 06, 2022: [Government Discovery Letter]
  • May 02, 2022: [Bail Report]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Text Only Order]
  • April 20, 2022: [Waiver of Appearance]
  • April 20, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 15, 2022: [Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 30, 2022: [Indictment]
  • March 30, 2022: [JS-45 Criminal Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.