U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin

wisconsin Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00101-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rogers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice - (Do not use this event for a Notice of Appeal)]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Dismiss (Misc)]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Warrant ]
  • May 13, 2022: [Warrant ]
  • May 12, 2022: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • May 04, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 04, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.