U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin

wisconsin Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00107-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bingenheimer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 03, 2023: [Judgment ]
  • January 03, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Defendant]
  • January 03, 2023: [Sentencing]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Sentencing Recommendation - SEALED]
  • December 27, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 29, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 07, 2022: [~Util - Speedy Trial Excludable Start]
  • September 07, 2022: [Status Conference ]
  • September 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 07, 2022: [Audio docketing digital upload]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 05, 2022: [Status Conference ]
  • August 05, 2022: [~Util - Speedy Trial Excludable Start]
  • August 05, 2022: [Audio docketing digital upload]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 22, 2022: [Case No Longer Referred]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 27, 2022: [Pretrial Order]
  • June 27, 2022: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • June 27, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 27, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing Via Zoom]
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 23, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report - Bond Study]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 24, 2022: [Release Status Report - Restricted Viewing]
  • May 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 10, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.