U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Wisconsin

wisconsin Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00056-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Gonzalez-Zarate, Paulino
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [CJA 21 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment - Redacted]
  • October 14, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 14, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 13, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • October 11, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 05, 2022: [Addendum to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 05, 2022: [Revised Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Letter stating no objections to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 13, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Sentencing]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Plea Hearing]
  • June 28, 2022: [Text Only Order]
  • June 28, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 01, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 26, 2022: [SLC Order on New Criminal Cases]
  • May 26, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • May 26, 2022: [Government Discovery Letter]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 25, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 24, 2022: [Bail Report]
  • May 19, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 12, 2022: [Indictment]
  • May 12, 2022: [JS-45 Criminal Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.