U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Wisconsin

wisconsin Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00055-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Didion Milling, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice of Expert Testimony]
  • January 23, 2023: [Brief in Reply]
  • January 18, 2023: [Redacted Document]
  • January 17, 2023: [Brief in Opposition]
  • January 17, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief (Motion)]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 12, 2023: [Seal Document]
  • January 12, 2023: [Exhibit]
  • January 12, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief (Motion)]
  • January 06, 2023: [Set Briefing Deadlines]
  • January 06, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 06, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 05, 2023: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 03, 2023: [Letter]
  • January 03, 2023: [Response to Order]
  • January 02, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 02, 2023: [Response to Order]
  • January 01, 2023: [Response to Order]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 28, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • December 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 22, 2022: [Compel]
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice of Expert Testimony]
  • December 22, 2022: [Brief in Support]
  • December 22, 2022: [Exhibit]
  • December 22, 2022: [Seal ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Sever Defendant]
  • December 22, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Strike ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Bill of Particulars ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Sever Count]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • December 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief (Motion)]
  • December 20, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief (Motion)]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Ex Parte Motion]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order]
  • December 08, 2022: [Brief in Reply]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 07, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 06, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • December 06, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • December 06, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief (Motion)]
  • December 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 05, 2022: [Brief in Opposition]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Ex Parte Motion]
  • November 23, 2022: [Set Briefing Deadlines]
  • November 22, 2022: [Compel]
  • November 18, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 10, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 09, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 07, 2022: [Response to Order]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Waiver of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order]
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 26, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief (Motion)]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order Converting Hearing to Video]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • August 24, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief (Motion)]
  • August 23, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • August 18, 2022: [Brief in Reply]
  • August 18, 2022: [Release Order]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • August 12, 2022: [Brief in Opposition]
  • August 12, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • August 12, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • August 11, 2022: [Release Order]
  • August 11, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • August 11, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 10, 2022: [Bail Report]
  • August 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Arraignment/Initial Appearance]
  • August 09, 2022: [Bail Report]
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 03, 2022: [Redacted Document]
  • August 03, 2022: [Motion to Seal]
  • August 03, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • August 03, 2022: [Waiver of Appearance]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [SLC Order on New Criminal Cases]
  • July 29, 2022: [Text Only Order]
  • July 29, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 28, 2022: [Demand]
  • July 28, 2022: [Brady Demand]
  • July 26, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • July 25, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • July 08, 2022: [Receipt for Passport]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • July 07, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • July 07, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 06, 2022: [Receipt for Passport]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order]
  • June 29, 2022: [Ex Parte Motion]
  • June 29, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 28, 2022: [Release Order]
  • June 28, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 24, 2022: [Bail Report]
  • June 23, 2022: [Bail Report]
  • June 22, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 17, 2022: [Bail Report]
  • June 15, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 10, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • June 08, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 07, 2022: [Text Only Order]
  • June 07, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA 23]
  • June 07, 2022: [Attorney Appointed]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 23, 2022: [Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 13, 2022: [Admit Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 13, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 12, 2022: [Indictment]
  • May 12, 2022: [JS-45 Criminal Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.