U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin

wisconsin Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00115-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Robbins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Judgment of Forfeiture ]
  • January 11, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 06, 2023: [Affidavit]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Transcript]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice - (Do not use this event for a Notice of Appeal)]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 18, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • October 18, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
  • October 06, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 26, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 25, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Status Conference ]
  • July 25, 2022: [~Util - Speedy Trial Excludable Start]
  • July 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 20, 2022: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • July 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed with arrest]
  • June 24, 2022: [Case No Longer Referred]
  • June 17, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed with arrest]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • May 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 19, 2022: [Pretrial Order]
  • May 19, 2022: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • May 19, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 19, 2022: [Oral Order for Statistical Purposes (no docket text)]
  • May 19, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • May 18, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report - Bond Study]
  • May 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 18, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.