U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin

wisconsin Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00116-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ciezki
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Attachments/Victim Name Change Request - Restricted to Applicable Parties]
  • May 01, 2025: [Leave to Update Victim Information (Public)]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 13, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • December 08, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 08, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • December 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 02, 2022: [Sentencing Recommendation - SEALED]
  • December 02, 2022: [Addendum to Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 04, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 04, 2022: [Text Only Order]
  • October 03, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 03, 2022: [Sentencing Recommendation - SEALED]
  • October 03, 2022: [Revised Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Letter]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • July 15, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 23, 2022: [~Util - Case No Longer Referred]
  • June 23, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • June 23, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 23, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 21, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report - Bond Study]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order]
  • June 01, 2022: [~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • June 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Electronic Filing Error]
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice - (Do not use this event for a Notice of Appeal)]
  • May 24, 2022: [Reassign]
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 20, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 20, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.