U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin

wisconsin Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00117-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mueller
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 01, 2022: [Judgment ]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 23, 2022: [Sentencing Recommendation - SEALED]
  • August 23, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 26, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 25, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 06, 2022: [Case No Longer Referred]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 30, 2022: [Text Only Order]
  • June 30, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 25, 2022: [Pretrial Order]
  • May 25, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • May 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 24, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.