U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin

wisconsin Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00088-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 24, 2022: [Complex Case Designation]
  • June 21, 2022: [Case No Longer Referred]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • June 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 16, 2022: [Pretrial Order]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 16, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 16, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 16, 2022: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • June 10, 2022: [Pretrial Order]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
  • June 10, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 10, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 10, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report - Bond Study]
  • June 10, 2022: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • June 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 03, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report - Bond Study]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • June 02, 2022: [Pretrial Order]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
  • June 02, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 02, 2022: [~Util - Add Attorney]
  • June 01, 2022: [Pretrial Order]
  • June 01, 2022: [Arraignment - Superseding]
  • June 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 25, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted]
  • May 25, 2022: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.