U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Wisconsin

wisconsin Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00071-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Bellis, Craig
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Judgment and Commitment - Redacted]
  • January 06, 2023: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 06, 2023: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 05, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • January 03, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Addendum to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 15, 2022: [Addendum to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 15, 2022: [Revised Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 28, 2022: [Letter stating no objections to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 16, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Set/Reset Plea Hearing]
  • August 23, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 09, 2022: [Waiver of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Text Only Order]
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Government Discovery Letter]
  • June 07, 2022: [Government Discovery Letter]
  • June 03, 2022: [Telephone Status Conference]
  • June 03, 2022: [SLC Order on New Criminal Cases]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Telephone Status Conference]
  • June 01, 2022: [Bail Report]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Status/Scheduling Conference]
  • May 26, 2022: [Indictment]
  • May 26, 2022: [JS-45 Criminal Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.