U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Wisconsin

wisconsin Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00107-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jackson, Kardell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Sentencing]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 01, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief (Motion)]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Set/Reset Plea Hearing]
  • November 30, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 17, 2022: [Letter]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Letter]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Bail Report]
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 21, 2022: [Government Discovery Letter]
  • September 21, 2022: [Text Only Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 21, 2022: [Release Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [SLC Order on New Criminal Cases]
  • September 21, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • September 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Arraignment/Initial Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.