U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin

wisconsin Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-00562-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Leon
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • October 27, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 27, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 27, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 27, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • October 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 18, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report - Bond Study]
  • October 18, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 18, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 18, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • October 18, 2022: [Complaint ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.