U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin

wisconsin Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00211-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez-Napoles
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed with arrest]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Complex Case Designation]
  • December 19, 2022: [~Util - Speedy Trial Excludable Start]
  • December 19, 2022: [Status Conference ]
  • December 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 19, 2022: [Complex Case Designation]
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 13, 2022: [Pretrial Order]
  • December 13, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 13, 2022: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • December 13, 2022: [Oral Order for Statistical Purposes (no docket text)]
  • December 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 13, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • December 12, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report - Bond Study]
  • December 12, 2022: [Documents Received - Rule 5, Rule 40, Rule 32.1]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • November 21, 2022: [Documents Received - Rule 5, Rule 40, Rule 32.1]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.