U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Wisconsin

wisconsin Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Edwards, Taiwan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 23, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • April 23, 2025: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 22, 2025: [Court Reporter Certification of Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet]
  • April 18, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA 23]
  • April 18, 2025: [Letter]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Text Only Order]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.