U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin

wisconsin Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bolden
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 30, 2025: [Pro Se Cover Letter]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 28, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Case]
  • April 17, 2025: [Judgment ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Sentencing Recommendation - SEALED]
  • April 10, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Response (Non-Motion)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.