U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin

wisconsin Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00194-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Joos
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Case]
  • May 01, 2025: [Judgment ]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Exhibits Received]
  • April 30, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Sentencing Recommendation - SEALED]
  • April 23, 2025: [Revised Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 22, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Letter]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 11, 2024: [Pretrial Order]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
  • October 11, 2024: [Arraignment]
  • October 11, 2024: [~Util - Add Attorney]
  • October 11, 2024: [Detention Hearing ]
  • October 11, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 11, 2024: [Oral Order for Statistical Purposes (no docket text)]
  • October 10, 2024: [Pretrial Services Report - Bond Study]
  • October 10, 2024: [Warrant Returned Executed with arrest]
  • October 10, 2024: [Arrest ]
  • October 08, 2024: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.