U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Wisconsin

wisconsin Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00066-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Angelica Mendoza Rubio
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Government Discovery Letter]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Final Pretrial Conference Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • April 29, 2025: [Witness List]
  • April 29, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • April 29, 2025: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 29, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Offer Evidence]
  • April 25, 2025: [Government Discovery Letter]
  • April 25, 2025: [In Limine]
  • April 22, 2025: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • April 22, 2025: [Response to Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 17, 2025: [In Limine]
  • April 17, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief (Motion)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Offer Evidence]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Protective Order ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Expert Testimony]
  • April 10, 2025: [Government Discovery Letter]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Expert Testimony]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order Distributing Draft Voir Dire]
  • March 11, 2025: [Telephone Status Conference]
December, 2024
  • December 27, 2024: [Text Only Order]
  • December 09, 2024: [Letter stating no pretrial motions to be filed]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Government Discovery Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.