U.S. District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin

wisconsin Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-mj-00120-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Kaeser, Sarah
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Set/Reset Plea Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Text Only Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice to Counsel]
  • April 22, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Expert Testimony]
  • March 10, 2025: [Telephone Pretrial Motion Hearing]
December, 2024
  • December 27, 2024: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.