U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin

wisconsin Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00023-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Finch et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order for Writ of Habeas Corpus for Prosecution]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Indictment - Redacted]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Unseal Case]
  • April 16, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 11, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 11, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 10, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed with arrest]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order for Writ of Habeas Corpus for Prosecution]
  • March 31, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report - Bond Study]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order for Writ of Habeas Corpus for Prosecution]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • March 19, 2025: [~Util - Speedy Trial Excludable Start]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 14, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 13, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report - Bond Study]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.