U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Wisconsin

wisconsin Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00088-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Joshua L. Lake
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 29, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 29, 2025: [Set/Reset Sentencing]
  • April 29, 2025: [Letter(s) in Support of Sentencing]
  • April 28, 2025: [Addendum to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 28, 2025: [Revised Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 25, 2025: [Judgment and Commitment - Redacted]
  • April 25, 2025: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 25, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 24, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 24, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 22, 2025: [Addendum to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 22, 2025: [Revised Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 22, 2025: [Certificate of Publication]
  • April 18, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 18, 2025: [Judgment and Commitment - Redacted]
  • April 18, 2025: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Addendum to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 16, 2025: [Revised Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 15, 2025: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 15, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 10, 2025: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 08, 2025: [Addendum to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 08, 2025: [Revised Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 01, 2025: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 27, 2025: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 25, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 17, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 13, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.