U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin

wisconsin Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Trammell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 24, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • April 14, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report - Bond Study]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 11, 2025: [Pretrial Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • April 11, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 10, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed with arrest]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order for Writ of Habeas Corpus for Prosecution]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.