U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Wisconsin

wisconsin Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00134-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Soung, John
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 28, 2025: [Court Exhibit]
  • April 28, 2025: [Pretrial Motion Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 25, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice to Counsel]
  • April 24, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 22, 2025: [Government Discovery Letter]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 21, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 16, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 08, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 07, 2025: [Text Only Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Government Discovery Letter]
  • April 02, 2025: [Telephone Status Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Set/Reset Status/Scheduling Conference]
  • March 28, 2025: [Dismiss ]
  • March 28, 2025: [Sealed Motion]
  • March 28, 2025: [Suppress ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.