U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin

wisconsin Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00166-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hurtado
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice - (Do not use this event for a Notice of Appeal)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • April 21, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Amended Plea Agreement]
  • April 04, 2025: [Report and Recommendation]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Case No Longer Referred]
  • April 04, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.