U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin

wisconsin Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00060-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Higgins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed with arrest]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 23, 2025: [Waiver of Rights Under Interstate Agreement on Detainers]
  • April 23, 2025: [Pretrial Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 23, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Prior Record Update Memo]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order for Writ of Habeas Corpus for Prosecution]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.