U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin

wisconsin Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00195-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Huynh et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 21, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • April 21, 2025: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 21, 2025: [Information - Plea Hearing]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 21, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 21, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report - Bond Study]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Text Only Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 14, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 11, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 11, 2025: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.