U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin

wisconsin Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-23602-kmp
  • Case Name: Kenda F Famous
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account(batch)]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Dismissing Case]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Proposed Order]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Lieske, Scott [Affidavit/Certification of Default]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.