U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin

wisconsin Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00560
  • Case Name: Pountney et al v. Cafe Corazon Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice - (Do not use this event for a Notice of Appeal)]
  • May 02, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice - (Do not use this event for a Notice of Appeal)]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice - (Do not use this event for a Notice of Appeal)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice - (Do not use this event for a Notice of Appeal)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice - (Do not use this event for a Notice of Appeal)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 22, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice - (Do not use this event for a Notice of Appeal)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice - (Do not use this event for a Notice of Appeal)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 17, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 17, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.