U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Wisconsin

wisconsin Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1-25-10919-cjf
  • Case Name: Scott Jay Finch and Janet Louise Finch
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Harring, Mark [Employee Income Records (Debtors Payment Advices)]
April, 2025
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Harring, Mark [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Pay Trustee]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Harring, Mark [Pay Trustee Wages (Debtor)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Harring, Mark [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Harring, Mark [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Re: Financial Management Course]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Harring, Mark [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Deficiency Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Harring, Mark [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Harring, Mark [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Harring, Mark [Auto-docket of credit card]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Harring, Mark [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Harring, Mark [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Harring, Mark [Form 122C-1 Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Harring, Mark [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13 - Case Upload]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Harring, Mark [Statement of Social Security Number]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.