U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Wisconsin

wisconsin Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-22134-kmp
  • Case Name: Angela Mae DeCoster
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Liebzeit, Larry H. [Installment Payment]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Liebzeit, Larry H. [Court Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Liebzeit, Larry H. [Order (Generic)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Liebzeit, Larry H. [Reaffirmation]
April, 2025
  • April 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Liebzeit, Larry H. [Installment Payment]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Liebzeit, Larry H. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Liebzeit, Larry H. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Liebzeit, Larry H. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Liebzeit, Larry H. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Liebzeit, Larry H. [Voluntary Petition - Attorney (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.