U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00016
  • Case Name: Young v. Wyoming Medium Correctional Insitution Warden et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 07, 2016: [Reply to Response]
February, 2016
  • February 02, 2016: [Order]
  • February 01, 2016: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • February 01, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2016
  • January 04, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 04, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2015
  • November 04, 2015: [~Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 04, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 04, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 03, 2015: [Order]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 11, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
February, 2015
  • February 03, 2015: [Requiring Service and Response]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.