U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:14-cv-00178
  • Case Name: Sealander v. Lucas
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • December 21, 2015: [Dismiss Case]
November, 2015
  • November 05, 2015: [~Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 03, 2015: [Order]
  • November 03, 2015: [Notice of Settlement Conference]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 30, 2015: [Response]
  • October 30, 2015: [Strike]
  • October 19, 2015: [Supplement]
  • October 19, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 19, 2015: [Add Party]
  • October 05, 2015: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • October 02, 2015: [Order]
September, 2015
  • September 29, 2015: [Transcript]
  • September 25, 2015: [Reply Brief]
  • September 23, 2015: [Response]
  • September 22, 2015: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • September 22, 2015: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • September 18, 2015: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 18, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 09, 2015: [Compel]
  • September 08, 2015: [Response]
  • September 04, 2015: [Strike]
  • September 04, 2015: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 02, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • August 28, 2015: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • August 27, 2015: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 26, 2015: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • August 25, 2015: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 25, 2015: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • August 25, 2015: [Compel]
  • August 14, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • August 12, 2015: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • August 12, 2015: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Non- Dispositive]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 27, 2015: [Quash]
  • July 08, 2015: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • July 08, 2015: [Order on Motion to Compel]
June, 2015
  • June 17, 2015: [Reply Brief]
February, 2015
  • February 04, 2015: [Joint Case Management Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.