U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:14-cv-00160
  • Case Name: Barbir v. Sharma et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Order]
  • July 20, 2017: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • November 14, 2016: [Response]
  • November 14, 2016: [Objection]
  • November 04, 2016: [Affidavit]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Remanding Case to State Court]
August, 2016
  • August 08, 2016: [Supplement]
  • August 08, 2016: [Brief]
July, 2016
  • July 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 13, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 13, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 11, 2016: [Order]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Transcript]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Response]
  • December 16, 2015: [Objection]
  • December 15, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • December 14, 2015: [Trial Witness and Exhibit List]
  • December 10, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 09, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue (Dispositive)]
  • December 08, 2015: [Trial Brief]
  • December 07, 2015: [Continue (Dispositive)]
September, 2015
  • September 17, 2015: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
February, 2015
  • February 04, 2015: [Setting Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.