U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00023
  • Case Name: Morrison v. Chesapeake Operating LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2016
  • January 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 04, 2016: [Dismiss]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Return of Subpoena]
  • November 16, 2015: [Designation of Experts]
  • November 12, 2015: [Return of Subpoena]
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [Return of Subpoena]
  • October 20, 2015: [Return of Subpoena]
September, 2015
  • September 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 22, 2015: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 18, 2015: [Return of Subpoena]
August, 2015
  • August 20, 2015: [Return of Subpoena]
  • August 17, 2015: [Return of Subpoena]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 30, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 22, 2015: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • June 19, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 19, 2015: [Protective Order]
  • June 18, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2015
  • February 11, 2015: [Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.