U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:13-cv-00148
  • Case Name: CASCO LLC v McDonald's Real Estate Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • March 13, 2019: [Dismiss Case]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • February 21, 2019: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • February 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Order on Mandate]
  • January 29, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2018
  • October 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • October 04, 2018: [Withdraw Document]
  • October 02, 2018: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Status Report]
  • September 13, 2018: [Transcript]
  • September 12, 2018: [Status Report]
  • September 11, 2018: [Status Report]
  • September 11, 2018: [USCA Order]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Status Report]
  • August 20, 2018: [Reply]
  • August 16, 2018: [Status Report]
  • August 14, 2018: [Status Report]
  • August 14, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 13, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 04, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • August 04, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 03, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 02, 2018: [Strike]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Enforce Judgment]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • June 18, 2018: [Reply]
  • June 18, 2018: [Withdraw Document]
  • June 15, 2018: [Reply]
  • June 08, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 08, 2018: [Transcript Letter]
  • June 01, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • June 01, 2018: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Stay Case]
  • May 18, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 18, 2018: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • May 18, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 19, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • April 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
  • March 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 19, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 21, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 18, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 15, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 11, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • December 04, 2017: [Response to Motion]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • November 20, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 07, 2017: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • November 06, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • October 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Dispositive]
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • August 14, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 03, 2017: [Hearing - Dispositive]
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Supplement]
  • July 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • July 05, 2017: [Reply]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • June 13, 2017: [Strike]
May, 2017
  • May 08, 2017: [Exhibit]
  • May 08, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • May 04, 2017: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • April 10, 2017: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • March 21, 2017: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • March 15, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 15, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Order]
  • February 21, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • February 06, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Order on Mandate]
  • January 17, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2016
  • January 13, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
August, 2015
  • August 18, 2015: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
  • August 14, 2015: [Transcript Letter]
  • August 12, 2015: [Response]
  • August 05, 2015: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • August 05, 2015: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Already on File) - Appeal]
  • August 05, 2015: [USCA Order]
  • August 04, 2015: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 01, 2015: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
July, 2015
  • July 30, 2015: [Notice of Appeal]
  • July 22, 2015: [Bill of Costs]
  • July 09, 2015: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • July 09, 2015: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • July 09, 2015: [Judgment]
  • July 07, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
February, 2015
  • February 17, 2015: [Designation of Experts]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.