U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:14-cv-00172
  • Case Name: McNeill et al v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 15, 2018: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
  • May 16, 2017: [Financial Entry]
  • May 08, 2017: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Already on File) - Appeal]
  • May 03, 2017: [Transcript Letter]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 19, 2017: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • April 19, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 17, 2017: [Transcript]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 24, 2017: [Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law]
  • February 16, 2017: [Deposition]
  • February 16, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • February 16, 2017: [Bench Trial - Completed]
  • February 15, 2017: [Bench Trial]
  • February 14, 2017: [Bench Trial - Began]
  • February 09, 2017: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • February 03, 2017: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
January, 2017
  • January 09, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • January 09, 2017: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • January 06, 2017: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • January 03, 2017: [Response]
  • January 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 27, 2016: [In Limine]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 21, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
November, 2016
  • November 09, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 09, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • November 02, 2016: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • November 01, 2016: [Order on Mandate]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • October 31, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
November, 2015
  • November 17, 2015: [USCA Order]
  • November 04, 2015: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • November 04, 2015: [Appeal Remark]
September, 2015
  • September 21, 2015: [Transcript Letter]
August, 2015
  • August 26, 2015: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Needed) - Appeal]
  • August 25, 2015: [USCA Order]
  • August 25, 2015: [Transcript Order Form - Court Reporter]
  • August 25, 2015: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • August 25, 2015: [Transcript Letter]
  • August 24, 2015: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Needed) - Appeal]
  • August 24, 2015: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
  • August 17, 2015: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 14, 2015: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • August 14, 2015: [Notice of Appeal]
  • August 05, 2015: [Motions No Longer Referred]
July, 2015
  • July 28, 2015: [Order]
  • July 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Reply]
  • June 24, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • June 17, 2015: [Vacating Hearing]
February, 2015
  • February 17, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.