U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00030
  • Case Name: Rothschild et al v. United States of America Department of Defense Department of the
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 15, 2016: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 14, 2016: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • March 08, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 03, 2016: [Setting Hearing]
  • March 02, 2016: [Order]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 12, 2016: [Consolidate Cases for Trial]
  • February 09, 2016: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • February 05, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 28, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • January 22, 2016: [Compel]
  • January 22, 2016: [Order]
  • January 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • January 19, 2016: [Withdraw Document]
  • January 15, 2016: [Compel]
  • January 12, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 05, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2015
  • October 14, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 14, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 13, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2015
  • August 04, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • August 03, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
June, 2015
  • June 22, 2015: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • June 22, 2015: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • June 12, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
February, 2015
  • February 24, 2015: [Notice of Complexity]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.